ND HB1417 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections 2, 38, and 40 of section 19-24.1-01, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-03, subdivision a of subsection 5 of section 19-24.1-05, subsection 7 of section 19-24.1-10, section 19-24.1-11, subsection 4 of section 19-24.1-21, and subsection 10 of section 19-24.1-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to access to medical marijuana; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Access to medical marijuana; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Mary Johnson [R] |
Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed J. Lee Anderson K. Roers |
2019-04-01 | House | Conference committee appointed Westlind Fegley Schneider |
2019-04-01 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 7 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |