ND HB1469 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 19-02.1-16.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to pharmacy benefits manager step therapy protocols.
Title
Pharmacy benefits manager step therapy protocols.
Sponsors
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Anderson K. Roers O. Larsen |
2019-04-02 | House | Conference committee appointed Kasper Schauer Adams |
2019-04-02 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |