ND HB1519 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 15 of section 19-24.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to debilitating medical conditions under the medical marijuana program; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Debilitating medical conditions under the medical marijuana program; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Andrew Marschall [R] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2019-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed K. Roers Anderson Clemens |
2019-04-01 | House | Conference committee appointed M. Ruby Westlind Damschen |
2019-04-01 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 1 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 4, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |