ND HB1541 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-12-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to presentations by the human trafficking commission.
Title
Presentations by the human trafficking commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Buffalo [D] | Rep. Clayton Fegley [R] | Rep. Lauriebeth Hager [D] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 60 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 60 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 15 |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report rejected |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 17 |
2019-04-18 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Luick Myrdal Bakke |
2019-04-04 | House | Conference committee appointed Paulson Karls Vetter |
2019-04-04 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 60 nays 30 |
2019-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, without recommendation 12 2 0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |