ND SB2002 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the secretary of state and public printing; to amend and reenact sections 54-09-05, 54-09-08, and 54-09-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the secretary of state, the general services operating fund, and fees charged by the secretary of state; to authorize a line item transfer during the 2017-19 biennium; to provide a report to the legislative assembly; to provide exemptions; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The salary of the secretary of state, the general services operating fund, and fees charged by the secretary of state; to authorize a line item transfer during the 2017-19 biennium; to provide a report to the legislative assembly; to provide exemptions; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-12 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 6 |
2019-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |