ND SB2011 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the securities department; and to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 10-04-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to collection of fees, civil penalties, and other moneys collected under the Securities Act.
Title
Collection of fees, civil penalties, and other moneys collected under the Securities Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/15 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 8 |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 2 3 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |