ND SB2036 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 4.1-45-22.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to technical corrections and improper, inaccurate, redundant, missing, or obsolete references; to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 12.1-31.2-01, section 14-09-00.1, subsection 1 of section 14-09-06.2, subsection 2 of section 27-20-30.1, subsection 1 of section 27-20-45, sections 43-62-01 and 43-62-15, subsection 5 of section 53-06.1-06, section 57-02-08.6, subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3, and section 57-60-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to technical corrections and improper, inaccurate, redundant, missing, or obsolete references; and to repeal sections 4.1-55-22.1, 6-09.8-04, 6-09.11-02, and 15-08.1-09 and chapter 61-21.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to technical corrections and improper, inaccurate, redundant, missing, or obsolete references.
Title
Technical corrections and improper, inaccurate, redundant, missing, or obsolete references.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |