ND SB2046 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 54-52-02.9, 54-52-06, and 54-52.1-03.2, subsection 1 of section 54-52.1-03.3, and section 54-52.6-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to employer contributions to the public employees defined benefit plan, defined contribution plan, and retiree health plan and participation in the retiree health plan.
Title
Employer contributions to the public employees defined benefit plan, defined contribution plan, and retiree health plan and participation in the retiree health plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 27 |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 8 2 |
2019-03-25 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported back, do pass 10 2 2 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:15 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 8 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |