ND SB2094 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 43-17-44, 43-17-45, and 43-62-14.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the practice of telemedicine and the regulation of fluoroscopy technologists; to amend and reenact sections 43-17-01, 43-17-02, and 43-17-02.3, subsection 1 of section 43-17.1-02, and sections 43-17.1-05, 43-17.1-05.1, and 43-17.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definitions of the practice of medicine and telemedicine, the practice of medicine, and the regulation of fluoroscopy technologists; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Title
The definitions of the practice of medicine and telemedicine, the practice of medicine, and the regulation of fluoroscopy technologists; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 2 |
2019-04-18 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Rohr Porter Dobervich |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee appointed J. Lee O. Larsen Hogan |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 5 |
2019-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |