ND SB2106 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 50-29-01, 50-29-02, 50-29-03, 50-29-04, and 50-29-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the children's health insurance program; to repeal section 50-29-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a continuing appropriation for grants and donations received for the children's health insurance program; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A continuing appropriation for grants and donations received for the children's health insurance program; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 10 |
2019-04-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3 |
2019-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 8 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 5 1 0 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |