ND SB2137 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 23-12-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cigar bars and lounges.
Title
Cigar bars and lounges.
Sponsors
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 30 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, without recommendation 6 0 0 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |