ND SB2148 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding article XIV of the Constitution of North Dakota and related issues.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study regarding article XIV of the Constitution of North Dakota and related issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Ethics Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Senate Select Committee on Ethics Committee |