ND SB2179 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 6-08.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the prevention of financial exploitation; and to amend and reenact section 6-08.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a financial institution's duty of confidentiality.
Title
A financial institution's duty of confidentiality.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 4 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |