ND SB2184 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 23-07.5-02, sections 65-01-02, 65-01-11, 65-01-15, 65-02-20, 65-02-21.1, 65-05-07, 65-05-08.1, and 65-05-08.3, subsections 5 and 12 of section 65-05-12.2, section 65-05-28, subsection 2 of section 65-05-29, section 65-05-30, subsection 3 of section 65-05-32, subsection 5 of section 65-05.1-01, subsection 6 of section 65-05.1-02, and subsection 1 of section 65-07-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of allied health care professional and health care provider with respect to workers' compensation claims and benefits.
Title
The definition of allied health care professional and health care provider with respect to workers' compensation claims and benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] |
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 2 |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |