ND SB2197 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 6-09-15.5 and subsection 1 of section 6-09.11-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to loans for family farmers.
Title
Loans for family farmers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] |
Rep. Michael Howe [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 5 |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-28 | House | Rereferred to Agriculture |
2019-02-28 | House | Request return from committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |