ND SB2225 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 14-09-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to familial duty to support for health services; to repeal section 50-01-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to familial duty to support for county welfare; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Familial duty to support for county welfare; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] |
Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Donald Longmuir [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-08 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |