ND 2317 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 23-01-37 and 23-09.3-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to health care facilities and licensure of nursing facilities; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for a report; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care facilities and licensure of nursing facilities; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for a report; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateSigned by Governor 04/30
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25SenateSigned by President
2019-04-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-24HouseEmergency clause carried
2019-04-24HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 3
2019-04-24HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2019-04-23SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-22HouseConference committee appointed Weisz Rohr Schneider
2019-04-19SenateConference committee appointed J. Lee K. Roers Hogan
2019-04-19SenateRefused to concur
2019-04-05SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 4
2019-04-04HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 2 4
2019-03-22HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-22HouseAmendment adopted
2019-03-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-03-04HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-02-12SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2019-02-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-06SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-06SenateAmendment adopted
2019-02-05SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-28SenateCommittee Hearing 10:45
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba2317.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0536-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0536-03005a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0536-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0536-04001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0536-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0536-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0536-07000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-28.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-61.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-73.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-74.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback