ND SB2391 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Kerzman, Koppelman, Weisz A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-06-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the alternatives-to-abortion services program; to provide for reports to the legislative council; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Kerzman, Koppelman, Weisz A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-06-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the alternatives-to-abortion services program; to provide for reports to the legislative council; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 089 nays 000 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-22 | Conf comm appointed Damschen Nathe Kilichowski | |
2009-04-17 | Appointed Krauter to replace Pomeroy on conf comm | |
2009-04-15 | Conf comm appointed Nelson Bellew Kerzman | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Erbele Dever Pomeroy | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 021 n 003 | |
2009-03-13 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-13 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 001 | |
2009-03-11 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-16 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-02-09 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-02-04 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2391.html |