NE LB1003 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change leave of absence without loss of pay provisions under the Military Code
Title
Change leave of absence without loss of pay provisions under the Military Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Thibodeau explanation of vote |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1911 adopted |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1911 filed |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1911 |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |