NE LB1007 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1007 amended into LB1071 by AM2182
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1007 amended into LB1071 by AM2182
Summary
Provide for performance measures under the Quality Education Accountability Act
Title
Provide for performance measures under the Quality Education Accountability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1007 amended into LB1071 by AM2182 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-29 | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Education Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9972 |