NE LB1012 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1012 amended into LB861 by AM2140
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1012 amended into LB861 by AM2140
Summary
Change State Racing Commission membership provisions
Title
Change State Racing Commission membership provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Kent Rogert [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1012 amended into LB861 by AM2140 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-11 | General Affairs AM2162 filed | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on General File with AM2162 | |
2010-01-29 | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to General Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9528 |