NE LB1034 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB998 by AM2460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB998 by AM2460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions and penalties relating to unlawful intrusion
Title
Change provisions and penalties relating to unlawful intrusion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1034 amended into LB998 by AM2460 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2343 filed |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2343 |
2014-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22267 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1034.pdf |