NE LB1041 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1041 amended into LB1042 by AM2132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1041 amended into LB1042 by AM2132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change retirement provisions relating to school employees
Title
Change retirement provisions relating to school employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1041 amended into LB1042 by AM2132 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22035 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1041.pdf |