NE LB1053 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB1053 by AM2806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB1053 by AM2806
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change various provisions under the Medical Assistance Act, Health Care Facility Licensure Act, and Medication Aide Act and change receiver and receivership provisions relating to health care facilities
Title
Change various provisions under the Medical Assistance Act, Health Care Facility Licensure Act, and Medication Aide Act and change receiver and receivership provisions relating to health care facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2806 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-24 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2806 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1043 amended into LB1053 by AM2806 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB833 amended into LB1053 by AM2806 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 11, 2020 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-08-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST73 |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Hunt AM3319 withdrawn |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER236 adopted |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Hunt AM3319 filed |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER236 filed |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER236 |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-07-24 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2806 adopted |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2806 filed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2806 |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Health and Human Services priority bill |
2020-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |