NE LB1067 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB475 amended into LB1067 by AM2540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB475 amended into LB1067 by AM2540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change sales and use tax refund provisions, extend sunset dates under certain tax incentive laws, and change provisions of the Angel Investment Tax Credit Act
Title
Change sales and use tax refund provisions, extend sunset dates under certain tax incentive laws, and change provisions of the Angel Investment Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB475 amended into LB1067 by AM2540 |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 09, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 03, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-04-01 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST79 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Hadley AM2540 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER186 adopted |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Hadley AM2540 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER186 filed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER186 |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Hadley AM2546 adopted |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Hadley AM2546 filed |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Hadley AM2457 adopted |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Hadley AM2457 filed |
2014-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-02-19 | Legislature | Garrett priority bill |
2014-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |