NE LB1071 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extend the deadline for acceptance of applications under the Convention Center Facility Financing Assistance Act
Title
Extend the deadline for acceptance of applications under the Convention Center Facility Financing Assistance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-02-27 | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2012 on AM2148 | |
2012-02-27 | Cornett AM2148 filed | |
2012-02-16 | Lathrop priority bill | |
2012-02-15 | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2012 | |
2012-01-20 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15955 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1071.pdf |