NE LB1081 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB651 amended into LB1081 by AM2593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB651 amended into LB1081 by AM2593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change education provisions regarding reporting, penalties, residency, boundaries, priority schools, subpoena authority, poverty, and limited English proficiency and adopt the Nebraska Reading Improvement Act
Title
Change education provisions regarding reporting, penalties, residency, boundaries, priority schools, subpoena authority, poverty, and limited English proficiency and adopt the Nebraska Reading Improvement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-1-2 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB651 amended into LB1081 by AM2593 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-1-2 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Linehan AM2823 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER143 adopted |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Linehan AM2823 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER143 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER143 |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Linehan AM2593 adopted |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Linehan AM2593 filed |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Education priority bill |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |