NE LB1093 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1093 amended into LB464 by AM2687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1093 amended into LB464 by AM2687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to juvenile facilitated conferencing and funding
Title
Change provisions relating to juvenile facilitated conferencing and funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1093 amended into LB464 by AM2687 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2279 filed |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2279 |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Brasch AM2145 filed |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22260 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1093.pdf |