NE LB1130 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to agreements and application deadlines under the Mutual Finance Assistance Act
Title
Change provisions relating to agreements and application deadlines under the Mutual Finance Assistance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Groene AM3006 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Groene AM3006 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 03, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST58 |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Groene AM3006 adopted |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Groene AM3006 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |