NE LB1144 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1085 amended into LB1144 by AM2785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1085 amended into LB1144 by AM2785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to youth rehabilitation and treatment centers and state institutions, create the Youth Rehabilitation and Treatment Center Special Oversight Committee of the Legislature, and provide duties for the Public Counsel
Title
Change provisions relating to youth rehabilitation and treatment centers and state institutions, create the Youth Rehabilitation and Treatment Center Special Oversight Committee of the Legislature, and provide duties for the Public Counsel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Howard AM3074 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Executive Board AM2785 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Howard AM3074 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Executive Board AM2785 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1085 amended into LB1144 by AM2785 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LR298 amended into LB1144 by AM2785 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Howard AM3074 adopted |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Howard AM3074 filed |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER209 adopted |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER209 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER209 |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2785 adopted |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Executive Board AM2785 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2785 |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Howard priority bill |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |