NE LB1145 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the penalty for pandering and create a task force and require training of certain officials regarding human trafficking
Title
Change the penalty for pandering and create a task force and require training of certain officials regarding human trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-03-29 | McGill AM2616 adopted | |
2012-03-29 | McGill AM2616 filed | |
2012-03-29 | Enrollment and Review ER228 adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Enrollment and Review ER228 filed | |
2012-03-27 | Placed on Select File with ER228 | |
2012-03-21 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-03-21 | Judiciary AM2387 adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Judiciary AM2387 filed | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on General File with AM2387 | |
2012-02-15 | Judiciary priority bill | |
2012-02-07 | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Cook name added | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Date of introduction |