NE LB1185 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB837 amended into LB1185 by AM2668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB837 amended into LB1185 by AM2668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to participation in the federal Child Care Subsidy program and criminal history record information checks for child care staff members and child care providers
Title
Change provisions relating to participation in the federal Child Care Subsidy program and criminal history record information checks for child care staff members and child care providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Howard AM3080 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2668 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Howard AM3080 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2668 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB837 amended into LB1185 by AM2668 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 03, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Howard AM3080 adopted |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Howard AM3080 filed |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER211 adopted |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER211 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER211 |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2668 adopted |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2668 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2668 |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |