NE LB1188 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1150 amended into LB1188 by AM2769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1150 amended into LB1188 by AM2769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to youth rehabilitation and treatment centers
Title
Change provisions relating to youth rehabilitation and treatment centers
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 42-4-3 (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Howard AM3099 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Howard AM3069 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Brandt AM2769 adopted (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2736 adopted (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Howard AM3099 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Legislature - Howard AM3069 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Brandt AM2769 adopted (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2736 adopted (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1150 amended into LB1188 by AM2769 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1149 amended into LB1188 by AM2736 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1147 amended into LB1188 by AM2736 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 42-4-3 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST62 |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Howard AM3099 adopted |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Howard AM3099 filed |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Brandt AM3087 withdrawn |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Brandt AM3087 filed |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Howard AM3069 adopted |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Howard AM3069 filed |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER212 adopted |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER212 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER212 |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Brandt AM2769 adopted |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2736 adopted |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Brandt AM2769 filed |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2736 filed |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2736 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Kolowski priority bill |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |