NE LB121 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the taxation of military benefits
Title
Change provisions relating to the taxation of military benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-28 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2017-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31122 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB121.pdf |