NE LB125 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Include certain intimate partners who are victims of theft within victim rights statutes
Title
Include certain intimate partners who are victims of theft within victim rights statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Lathrop FA13 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Legislature - Lathrop FA13 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Hansen, M. explanation of vote |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER41 adopted |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER41 filed |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER41 |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Lathrop FA13 adopted |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Lathrop FA13 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |