NE LB130 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt radon resistant new construction requirements
Title
Adopt radon resistant new construction requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 40-4-5 (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - DeBoer AM1107 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM298 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - DeBoer AM1107 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM298 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 02, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 40-4-5 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-04-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST16 |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | DeBoer AM1107 adopted |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER55 adopted |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | DeBoer AM1107 filed |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER55 filed |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER55 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM298 adopted |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM298 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM298 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |