NE LB145 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB145 amended into LB259 by AM933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB145 amended into LB259 by AM933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a hearing to determine financial ability to pay fines and costs and traffic citations and provide for community service
Title
Provide for a hearing to determine financial ability to pay fines and costs and traffic citations and provide for community service
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB145 amended into LB259 by AM933 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-04-12 | Legislature | Judiciary AM828 filed |
2017-04-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM828 |
2017-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 16, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31220 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB145.pdf |