NE LB157 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the prepaid wireless surcharge determination and duties of sellers and the Department of Revenue under the Prepaid Wireless Surcharge Act
Title
Change the prepaid wireless surcharge determination and duties of sellers and the Department of Revenue under the Prepaid Wireless Surcharge Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM1906 withdrawn |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Friesen AM1906 filed |
2018-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Friesen AM1718 adopted |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Friesen AM1718 filed |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Friesen AM1693 adopted |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Friesen AM1693 filed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |