NE LB159 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST9 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER33 adopted |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER33 filed |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER33 |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |