NE LB174 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent relating to appropriations for the Office of Violence Prevention
Title
State intent relating to appropriations for the Office of Violence Prevention
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB174 amended into LB294 by AM1329 |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37280 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB174.pdf |