NE LB178 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB178 amended into LB418 by AM1266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB178 amended into LB418 by AM1266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to workers' compensation claims, tort claims against the state, and state vehicles
Title
Change provisions relating to workers' compensation claims, tort claims against the state, and state vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB178 amended into LB418 by AM1266 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 25, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 25, 2019 (cancel) |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 25, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36942 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB178.pdf |