NE LB183 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the valuation of agricultural land and horticultural land for purposes of certain school district taxes
Title
Change the valuation of agricultural land and horticultural land for purposes of certain school district taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Briese MO102 failed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Revenue AM158 adopted (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Briese AM517 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Revenue AM158 adopted (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Briese AM517 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Hunt AM1971 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM1968 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Chambers AM1967 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Chambers AM1966 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh AM1965 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Hilgers FA81 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Briese FA80 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Briese MO102 failed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Briese MO102 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO101 pending |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO101 pending |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO101 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Briese AM1962 pending |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Briese AM1962 filed |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Briese AM709 withdrawn |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Slama AM1939 filed |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Briese AM1846 filed |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 19-005 to Briese |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Briese priority bill |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Briese AM708 filed |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Briese AM707 filed |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Briese AM709 filed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Revenue AM158 adopted |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Briese AM517 adopted |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Briese AM517 pending |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Briese AM517 filed |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Briese FA17 withdrawn |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Crawford FA5 withdrawn |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Wayne MO11 withdrawn |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Briese FA17 filed |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Crawford FA5 filed |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Wayne MO11 pending |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Wayne MO11 Bracket until April 1, 2019 filed |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Revenue AM158 pending |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Revenue AM158 pending |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Revenue AM158 pending |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Revenue AM158 filed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM158 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |