NE LB186 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions governing certain documents and adopt the Online Notary Public Act
Title
Change provisions governing certain documents and adopt the Online Notary Public Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Lindstrom AM1937 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM111 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Lindstrom AM1937 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM111 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM1823 withdrawn |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM1937 adopted |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM1937 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM1823 filed |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER23 adopted |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER23 filed |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER23 |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM111 adopted |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM111 filed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM111 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |