NE LB205 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Surgical Technologist Registration Act
Title
Adopt the Surgical Technologist Registration Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1436 lost (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1436 lost (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1436 lost |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Murman name withdrawn |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-04-25 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1436 filed |
2019-04-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1436 |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Wishart name added |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |