NE LB209 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by Governor on June 04, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Require information, materials, and reporting regarding continuing a viable pregnancy after taking mifepristone and change provisions relating to public indecency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require information, materials, and reporting regarding continuing a viable pregnancy after taking mifepristone and change provisions relating to public indecency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 36-12-1 (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Legislature - Albrecht MO110 prevailed (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Legislature - Hunt MO109 failed (Y: 8 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Albrecht MO105 prevailed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Blood AM1875 adopted (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Hunt MO71 failed (Y: 8 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Albrecht MO77 prevailed (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Legislature - Chambers MO76 failed (Y: 8 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Howard AM1524 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1432 adopted (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06LegislatureApproved by Governor on June 04, 2019
2019-05-31LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB13 amended into LB209 by AM1875
2019-05-31LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 30, 2019
2019-05-30LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-05-30LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 36-12-1
2019-05-30LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2019-05-30LegislatureAlbrecht MO110 prevailed
2019-05-30LegislatureAlbrecht MO110 Invoke cloture filed
2019-05-30LegislatureHunt MO109 failed
2019-05-30LegislatureHunt MO109 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
2019-05-30LegislatureWishart FA64 withdrawn
2019-05-30LegislatureMotion to return to Select File withdrawn
2019-05-23LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST39
2019-05-23LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-05-23LegislatureAlbrecht MO105 prevailed
2019-05-23LegislatureAlbrecht MO105 Invoke cloture filed
2019-05-23LegislatureBlood AM1875 adopted
2019-05-23LegislatureBlood AM1875 pending
2019-05-23LegislatureBlood AM1875 filed
2019-05-23LegislatureWishart FA63 withdrawn
2019-05-23LegislatureHunt MO104 withdrawn
2019-05-23LegislatureHunt MO104 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
2019-05-23LegislatureChambers FA61 withdrawn
2019-05-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER105 adopted
2019-05-08LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER105 filed
2019-05-08LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER105
2019-05-07LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-05-07LegislatureHunt MO71 failed
2019-05-07LegislatureAlbrecht MO77 prevailed
2019-05-07LegislatureAlbrecht MO77 Invoke cloture filed
2019-05-07LegislatureChambers MO76 failed
2019-05-02LegislatureHunt AM1535 filed
2019-05-01LegislatureWishart FA64 filed
2019-05-01LegislatureWishart FA63 filed
2019-05-01LegislatureChambers MO76 pending
2019-05-01LegislatureChambers MO76 pending
2019-05-01LegislatureChambers MO76 Bracket until June 6, 2019 filed
2019-05-01LegislatureHunt MO71 pending
2019-04-29LegislatureChambers FA61 filed
2019-04-29LegislatureHunt MO71 pending
2019-04-29LegislatureHunt MO71 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed
2019-04-29LegislatureHoward AM1524 adopted
2019-04-29LegislatureHoward AM1524 filed
2019-04-29LegislatureJudiciary AM1432 adopted
2019-04-24LegislatureJudiciary AM1432 filed
2019-04-24LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1432
2019-03-19LegislatureHughes name added
2019-03-19LegislatureAlbrecht priority bill
2019-03-18LegislatureMoser name added
2019-03-05LegislatureGroene name added
2019-02-27LegislatureDorn name added
2019-02-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 20, 2019
2019-01-15LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37284
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB209.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Final/LB209.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Slip/LB209.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4599
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4600
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4670
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4669
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4671
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4672
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4951
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4950
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=4952
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5078
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5077
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5080

Bill Comments

feedback