NE LB212 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB239 amended into LB212 by AM380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB239 amended into LB212 by AM380
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to budget limitations and procedures, hearing notices for county budgets and property tax requests, and videoconferences and telephone conferences
Title
Change provisions relating to budget limitations and procedures, hearing notices for county budgets and property tax requests, and videoconferences and telephone conferences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers AM1139 lost (Y: 1 N: 27 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM380 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers AM1139 lost (Y: 1 N: 27 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM380 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB239 amended into LB212 by AM380 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB212 by AM380 |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER63 adopted |
2019-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER63 filed |
2019-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER63 |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers AM1139 lost |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers AM1139 filed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM380 adopted |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM380 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM380 |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |