NE LB225A | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Schilz name added
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Schilz name added
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Schilz name added |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | McCoy name added |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Smith FA78 adopted |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Smith FA78 filed |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-02-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-02-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |