NE LB236 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change access to sales and use tax information with respect to the Nebraska Advantage Transformational Tourism and Redevelopment Act
Title
Change access to sales and use tax information with respect to the Nebraska Advantage Transformational Tourism and Redevelopment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 06, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER151 adopted |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER151 filed |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER151 |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2019 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |