NE LB262 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change membership and duties of long-term restrictive housing work group

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change membership and duties of long-term restrictive housing work group

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-13LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-05-31LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB262 amended into LB686 by AM1737
2019-02-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 27, 2019
2019-01-17LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback