NE LB269 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB579 amended into LB269 by AM611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB579 amended into LB269 by AM611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to ignition interlock permits and school permits
Title
Change provisions relating to ignition interlock permits and school permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Quick AM611 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Quick AM611 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB579 amended into LB269 by AM611 |
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Wayne AM1104 withdrawn |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Wayne AM1103 withdrawn |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Wayne AM1102 withdrawn |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Wayne AM1101 withdrawn |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Wayne AM1100 withdrawn |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER50 adopted |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Wayne AM1104 filed |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Wayne AM1103 filed |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Wayne AM1102 filed |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Wayne AM1101 filed |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Wayne AM1100 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER50 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER50 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Quick AM611 adopted |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Quick AM611 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |